judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-96-00520-CR
02-96-00520-CR
11/12/1996
Robbery
Massey, Forris Andre
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/23/1997Mandate Issued
07/31/1997Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
07/18/1997Order Entered
07/14/1997Mandate Issued
07/01/1997Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
05/29/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/23/1997Submitted
04/23/1997Submission
04/08/1997Brief Filed
04/08/1997Case ready to be set
03/19/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/14/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
02/12/1997Brief Filed
02/12/1997Submission
01/13/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/10/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/12/1996Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
11/12/1996Jury lists and/or questionnaires filed
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Massey, Forris AndreCriminal - AppellantWilliam Stanley Harris
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasTim Curry
Trial Court Information
371st District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Wayne Francis Salvant
0561954D
Ct1:Life IDTDCJ