judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00036-CR
09-81-00036-CR
09/17/1981
Theft
Goodwill, Gary Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/10/1982Mandate Issued
05/19/1982Petition for ReviewRefused
03/08/1982Petition for Review
01/20/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/20/1981Brief Filed
11/10/1981Brief Filed
10/15/1981Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/17/1981Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/10/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court
Jefferson
38682,38807
10 Years Prob & $2000 Fine