judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00006-CV
09-81-00006-CV
09/16/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Lancashire Homes, Inc.
Bridges, Carlton
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/13/1982Case stored
07/13/1982Mandate Issued
05/27/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/10/1981Brief Filed
11/16/1981Brief Filed
10/16/1981Statement of Facts Filed
09/16/1981Transcript Filed
05/21/1981Submitted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/13/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1
Angelina
Honorable Larry Gist
3543