judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00265-CR
08-81-00265-CR
11/10/1981
Other Felony
Beck, Marilyn Prample
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
04/15/1983Mandate Issued
02/09/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/06/1982Submitted
07/07/1982Submission
04/07/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/24/1982No description available.
11/10/1981Brief Filed
11/10/1981Brief Filed
11/10/1981Statement of Facts Filed
11/10/1981Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/15/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
205th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Sam W. Callan
34897-205
10 yrs. probated