judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00406-CV
04-81-00406-CV
11/06/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Battros, Mitchell
Radnitz, Allan, Posin, Thomas and Broude, Jeffrey
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/07/1984Mandate Issued
05/07/1984Mandate Issued
05/02/1984Case Returned from Higher Court
04/11/1984Higher Court DecisionRefused
02/28/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/23/1984Writ of Error filed
01/24/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/23/1984Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/18/1984Response to Motion Filed
01/10/1984Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed
01/05/1984Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/21/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/21/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/15/1983Submission
02/15/1983Submission
02/15/1983Submitted
02/08/1983Brief Filed
12/23/1982Submission Letter Sent
02/23/1982Requests Oral Argument
02/22/1982Requests Oral Argument
01/11/1982Brief Filed
01/11/1982Case ready to be set
01/06/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/04/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/09/1981Mot. EOT to file Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/07/1981Brief Filed
12/01/1981Mot. EOT to file Record Filed
11/06/1981Mot. EOT to file Record Filed
11/06/1981Record Filed
11/06/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/09/1981Appeal Bond Filed
07/14/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/07/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
131st Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Peter Michael Curry
80-CI-12120