judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-3999
B-3999
05/08/1973
Application for Writ of Error
HENRY L. SEALE, DBA SEALE ENTERPRISES
CARL V. NICHOLS, DBA THE FASHION BEAUTY SALON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/05/1973Response to Brief filedPetitioner
10/26/1973Supplement to ResponseRespondent
05/23/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
05/08/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/06/1974Opinion issued
11/05/1973Response to Brief filed
10/26/1973Supplement to Response
07/11/1973Document received (See Remarks)
05/23/1973Response to Petition
05/08/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/08/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Carl V. Nichols, dba The Fashion Beauty SalonRespondent
Henry L. Seale, dba Seale EnterprisesPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information