judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2439
A-2439
11/23/1949
Application for Writ of Error
MONTGOMERY WALLACE
HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/09/1950Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/07/1950Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/02/1950Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
12/12/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
11/23/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/09/1950Motion for Rehearing
01/25/1950Opinion issued
01/07/1950Supplemental Brief filed
01/02/1950Supplemental Brief filed
12/14/1949Document received (See Remarks)
12/14/1949Document received (See Remarks)
12/14/1949Document received (See Remarks)
12/12/1949Response to Petition
11/23/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/23/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hartford Accident and Indemnity CompanyRespondent
Montgomery WallacePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information