judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6358
A-6358
05/15/1957
Application for Writ of Error
DALLAS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT, CITY AND COUNTY OF DALLAS LEVEE IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT, DALLAS COUNTY LEVEE IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 5
C. C. BENSON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/06/1957Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/15/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
06/15/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
06/15/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
05/15/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
05/15/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
05/15/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/06/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/23/1957Opinion issued
06/19/1957Document received (See Remarks)
06/15/1957Response to Petition
06/15/1957Response to Petition
06/15/1957Response to Petition
05/22/1957Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
05/15/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/15/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/15/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/15/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City and County of Dallas Levee Improvement DistrictPetitioner
Dallas County Levee Improvement District No. 5Petitioner
Dallas County Flood Control DistrictPetitioner
C. C. Benson, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information