judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6269
A-6269
03/26/1957
Application for Writ of Error
ALAMO EXPRESS INC., ET AL.
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/28/1958Supplement to ResponseRespondent
02/18/1958Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/05/1957Appendix FiledRespondent
04/16/1957Reply to ResponseRespondent
04/04/1957Response to PetitionPetitioner
03/26/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
03/26/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/28/1958Supplement to Response
02/18/1958Reply to Response
02/11/1958Response to Motion filed
02/05/1958Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
01/15/1958Concurring Opinion issued.
01/15/1958Opinion issued
06/05/1957Appendix Filed
04/16/1957Reply to Response
04/04/1957Response to Petition
03/26/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/26/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/26/1957Document received (See Remarks)
03/26/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Alamo Express Inc., et al.Petitioner
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information