judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00036-CV
09-81-00036-CV
10/21/1981
Contract
Beauchamp, Leroy John
Tosborne, Richard M. & Joanne
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/17/1983Mandate Issued
02/17/1983Case Returned from Higher Ct.
01/26/1983Writ DisposedRefused
11/05/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
11/04/1982Writ Filed
10/26/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/25/1982Writ Filed
09/23/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/23/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/17/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/17/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/02/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/23/1982Submitted
01/26/1982Submission
10/21/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/17/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
240th District Court
Fort Bend
Honorable Larry Gist
34,640 C