judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00357-CR
04-81-00357-CR
10/21/1981
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Jackson, Wesley Valsom
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/07/1984Mandate Issued
12/07/1984Mandate Issued
11/21/1984Higher Court DecisionReversed and Remanded
08/30/1984Information regarding cause received
04/25/1984Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
01/23/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
01/20/1984Petition for Review Filed
12/21/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/21/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/13/1983Submission
04/13/1983Submission
04/13/1983Submitted
10/22/1981Case ready to be set
10/22/1981Brief Filed
10/22/1981Case ready to be set
10/21/1981Record Filed
10/21/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/29/1981Brief Filed
07/31/1981Record Approved
01/29/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
187th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Pat Priest
79-CR-2313
8 Years