judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-987
B-987
06/25/1968
Application for Writ of Error
HELEN HIGH, ET VIR
GEORGE GLAMEYER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/16/1968Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/02/1968Response to PetitionRespondent
07/16/1968Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/25/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/21/1968Response to Motion filed
10/16/1968Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/02/1968Response to Petition
07/16/1968Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/25/1968Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/25/1968Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
George GlameyerRespondent
James A. PakenhamAmicus Curiae
Helen High, et virPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information