judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-81-00698-CR
01-81-00698-CR
09/24/1981
Robbery
Carter, James
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/19/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/16/1984Higher court decisionAffirmed
09/21/1983No description available.Grant motion
06/15/1983No description available.
05/05/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/09/1983Submitted
02/10/1983Submission
11/03/1982Supplemental brief filed
10/14/1982Brief filed
09/21/1982Brief filed
08/26/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/29/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/28/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/28/1982Order for review
06/23/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/23/1982Record filed
09/24/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/19/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
230th District Court
Harris
Honorable JOE KEGANS
340,781
life