judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2552
A-2552
02/10/1950
Application for Writ of Error
ERNEST MCASHAN, ET AL.
S. E. CAVITT, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/27/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/31/1950Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
02/15/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
02/10/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/17/1950Opinion issued
04/27/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/31/1950Supplemental Brief filed
03/15/1950Document received (See Remarks)
02/15/1950Response to Petition
02/10/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/10/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ernest McAshan, et al.Petitioner
S. E. Cavitt, et al.Respondent
Allright, Inc.Amicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information