judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2443
A-2443
01/13/1950
Application for Writ of Error
CHARLES A. OFERRAL
W. J. COOLIDGE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/22/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/10/1950Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
01/18/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
01/13/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/24/1950Response to Motion filed
03/22/1950Motion for Rehearing
03/08/1950Opinion issued
02/10/1950Supplemental Brief filed
01/18/1950Response to Petition
01/13/1950Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/13/1950Document received (See Remarks)
01/13/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Charles A. OFerralPetitioner
W. J. Coolidge, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information