judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2533
A-2533
02/03/1950
Application for Writ of Error
PERRY C. MOFFIT, ET AL.
MRS. URSULA HEIBY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/22/1950Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
02/13/1950Response to PetitionPetitioner
02/03/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
02/03/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/1950Motion for Rehearing
05/17/1950Dissenting opinion issued.
05/17/1950Opinion issued
02/22/1950Supplemental Brief filed
02/22/1950Document received (See Remarks)
02/22/1950Document received (See Remarks)
02/13/1950Response to Petition
02/03/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/03/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/03/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Perry C. Moffit, et al.Petitioner
Mrs. Ursula HeibyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information