judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00200-CR
08-81-00200-CR
10/27/1981
Other Felony
Johnson, James Allen
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
12/17/1982Decision from Supreme Court or CCAAffirmed
12/17/1982Petition for Discretionary ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
11/01/1982Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc.
10/22/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/12/1982Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
10/12/1982Petition for Discretionary Review
08/25/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/09/1982Submitted
03/31/1982Submission
10/27/1981Brief Filed
10/27/1981Brief Filed
10/27/1981Statement of Facts Filed
10/27/1981Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/17/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
142nd District Court
Midland
Honorable Vann Culp
CRB-7905
2 Yrs.