judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00383-CV
04-81-00383-CV
10/29/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Castillo, Sr., Hector, a/n/f Castillo, Hector, Jr.& Richardo
Sears, Roebuck and Co., and Mall Del Norte
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/06/1984Mandate Issued
08/06/1984Mandate Issued
07/17/1984Case Returned from Higher Court
07/11/1984Order EnteredRefused
06/06/1984Higher Court DecisionRefused
02/06/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
01/27/1984Writ of Error filed
12/27/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/21/1983Response to Motion Filed
12/20/1983Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/16/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/09/1983Motion to Supplement Record Filed
11/30/1983Motion for Reconsideration DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/30/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/30/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/24/1983Motion Held in Abeyance
02/15/1983Submission
02/15/1983Submission
02/15/1983Submitted
02/08/1983Motion for Reconsideration Filed
12/23/1982Submission Letter Sent
04/22/1982Requests Oral Argument
04/22/1982Requests Oral Argument
04/22/1982Brief Filed
04/22/1982Case ready to be set
04/20/1982Requests Oral Argument
04/06/1982Brief Filed
03/31/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/31/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/12/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
03/12/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
03/11/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/11/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/28/1982Response to Motion Filed
01/22/1982Brief Filed
01/22/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/21/1982Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/29/1981No Description Available.
10/29/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/26/1981Appeal Bond Filed
10/07/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/06/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
111th Judicial District Court
Webb
Honorable B. B. Schraub
32,178