judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00387-CV
04-81-00387-CV
10/28/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Industrial Disposal Supply Company
Perryman Brothers Trash Service, Inc. & Southern Refuse Co.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/11/1984Mandate Issued
07/11/1984Case Returned from Higher Court
07/11/1984Mandate Issued
06/20/1984Higher Court DecisionRefused
02/10/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/08/1984Writ of Error filed
01/09/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/29/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/14/1983Opinion issuedAff/Rev & Remanded to Trial Ct
12/14/1983Opinion issuedAff/Rev & Remanded to Trial Ct
02/24/1983Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/15/1983Submission
02/15/1983Submission
02/15/1983Submitted
02/10/1983Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief Filed
12/23/1982Submission Letter Sent
12/08/1982Memorandum of Authorities Filed
02/05/1982Requests Oral Argument
02/05/1982Requests Oral Argument
02/04/1982Requests Oral Argument
01/29/1982Brief Filed
01/29/1982Brief Filed
01/29/1982Case ready to be set
01/07/1982Motion to Consolidate Cases DisposedFiling is Moot
01/07/1982No Description Available.
01/07/1982Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/04/1982Brief Filed
01/04/1982Brief Filed
12/28/1981Response to Motion Filed
12/18/1981Motion to Consolidated Cases Filed
12/18/1981Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript Filed
12/18/1981No Description Available.
12/04/1981No Description Available.
11/19/1981No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/02/1981No Description Available.
10/29/1981No Description Available.
10/28/1981No Description Available.
10/28/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/28/1981Appeal Bond Filed
09/03/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/11/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
166th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carol R. Haberman
81-CI-3500