judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00044-CV
09-81-00044-CV
10/29/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Norvell Wilder Supply Co.
Employers Casualty Company
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/28/1983Mandate Issued
01/27/1983Case Returned from Higher Ct.
12/15/1982Writ DisposedDismissed
10/19/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/18/1982Writ Filed
09/16/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/27/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/12/1982Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
02/04/1982Submitted
11/23/1981Brief Filed
11/03/1981Brief Filed
10/29/1981Submission
10/29/1981Transcript Filed
10/12/1981Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/28/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
136th District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Jack R. King
D 107221