judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-81-01106-CR
05-81-01106-CR
10/28/1981
Delivery of a Controlled Substance
Dock Mathis
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/25/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
04/27/1987Letter issued by the court
10/07/1985Letter issued by the court
12/12/1983Letter issued by the court
12/09/1983Petition for writ of habeas corpus received
10/31/1983Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
10/31/1983Case Returned from Higher Ct.
10/31/1983Mandate Issued
10/07/1983Notice filed
06/06/1983Letter issued by the court
05/26/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
05/26/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtRefused
05/02/1983Letter received
04/13/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/16/1983Submitted
02/11/1983Submission
02/02/1983Letter issued by the court
02/01/1983Letter received
01/20/1983Brief Filed
11/29/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/29/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/09/1982Motion filed
11/04/1982Affidavit filed
10/04/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/30/1982Letter issued by the court
09/20/1982Letter received
09/10/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/10/1982Brief Filed
09/10/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/28/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/28/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/28/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/13/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/30/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/23/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/02/1982Clerks record filed
03/02/1982Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
01/13/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
10/28/1981Motion for extension of time to file record filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/31/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
265th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 265th District Court
F80-16610-IR
Life, TDC