judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00230-CR
08-81-00230-CR
10/30/1981
Burglary
Boozer, Terry Lynn
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
07/05/1982Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Granted
05/20/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/10/1982Petition for Discretionary Review
04/07/1982Opinion issued
04/07/1982Opinion issued
02/18/1982Submitted
02/18/1982Submission
02/18/1982Submitted
12/30/1981Submission
10/30/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/30/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/05/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
291861
10 years