judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-81-00809-CR
01-81-00809-CR
10/29/1981
Burglary
Williams, Marcellus Lee
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/07/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/17/1983Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
09/21/1983No description available.Refused
04/29/1983No description available.
03/17/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/13/1983Submission
11/03/1982Brief filed
10/04/1982Brief filed
09/09/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/30/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/17/1982Record filed
10/29/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/07/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
337,628
10 years