judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00281-CR
04-81-00281-CR
09/22/1981
Burglary
Briggs, Thomas Anthony
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
03/14/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
03/11/1983Mandate Issued
03/11/1983Mandate Issued
01/19/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/19/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/12/1983Submission
01/12/1983Submission
01/12/1983Submitted
09/22/1981Case ready to be set
09/22/1981Brief Filed
09/22/1981Record Filed
09/22/1981Case ready to be set
09/22/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/15/1981Brief Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
187th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Pat Priest
80-CR-1835
Five years