Case: 07-82-00339-CR
07-82-00339-CR
08/19/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Oliver, Jodie Mack
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/06/1984 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/02/1984 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/31/1984 | Submitted | | |
04/01/1983 | Case ready to be set | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/06/1984 | Case Stored | Case stored |
11/03/2014 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
72nd District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Cecil G. Puryear
24,464
Life