judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0287-94
PD-0287-94
03/14/1994
PDR Case Type
HILL, N'NAMDI YAPHET
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/02/1994FINAL DISPRefused
05/18/1994PDR DISPRefused
05/18/1994PDR DISPRefused
04/18/1994NO RESPONSE FILED
03/14/1994PDR FILED
03/14/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/14/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn B. Holmes
HILL, N'NAMDI YAPHETApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Charles Freeman
Court of Appeals Information:
01-93-00030-CR
AFF 12-23-93
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
183rd District Court
Harris
Honorable JAY W. BURNETT
614510