judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00387-CV
14-94-00387-CV
04/14/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Caston, Charles
North Forest Independent School District
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/28/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/17/1995Case stored
01/08/1995Mandate Issued
01/08/1995Mandate Issued
12/08/1994Motion for rehearing DUE
12/08/1994No motion for rehearing FILED
11/23/1994Opinion issuedDISMISSED
11/23/1994Opinion issuedDISMISSED
11/21/1994Submitted
11/21/1994Submission
11/21/1994Submitted
04/28/1994Misc motion DISPOSEDDENIED
04/22/1994Misc Motion filed
04/14/1994Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA,
04/14/1994Motion to appeal as indigent
04/14/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/03/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
02/07/1994Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/08/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeMichael J. Siwierka
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantCharles Caston
Trial Court Information
215th District Court
Harris
Honorable EUGENE CHAMBERS
92-47358