judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6158
A-6158
01/02/1957
Application for Writ of Error
M. M. VICARS
H. L. STOKELY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/27/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/02/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/02/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/01/1957Letter Filed
03/29/1957Response to Motion filed
03/27/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/13/1957Opinion issued
01/02/1957Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/02/1957Response to Petition
01/02/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
H. L. StokelyRespondent
M. M. VicarsPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information