judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6548
A-6548
10/14/1957
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF AMARILLO
S. G. STOCKTON, DBA STOCKTON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, JOHNNY GRAY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/08/1957Supplement to ResponsePetitioner
11/01/1957Reply to ResponseRespondent
10/28/1957Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
10/24/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
10/23/1957Response to PetitionPetitioner
10/14/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
10/14/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/05/1958Order from Lower Court filed
03/12/1958Opinion issued
11/20/1957Document received (See Remarks)
11/08/1957Supplement to Response
11/01/1957Reply to Response
10/28/1957Brief on the Merits
10/24/1957Response to Petition
10/23/1957Response to Petition
10/14/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/14/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/14/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
S. G. Stockton, dba Stockton Construction CompanyRespondent
Johnny GrayRespondent
City of AmarilloPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information