judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6555
A-6555
10/18/1957
Application for Writ of Error
LILLIE CLIFTON, LILLIE M. CLIFTON, ET AL.
MAGNOLIA PETROLEUM COMPANY, R. W. KOONTZ, EARL A. BROWN, R. W. KOONTZ, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/20/1959Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
07/09/1959Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/23/1959Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/04/1958Response to Brief filedRespondent
10/06/1958Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
10/01/1958Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/01/1958Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/26/1958Response to Brief filedRespondent
09/19/1958Brief on the MeritsRespondent
08/25/1958Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
08/22/1958Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/17/1958Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/23/1958Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/16/1958Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
06/11/1958Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
06/09/1958Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/07/1958Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/08/1958Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/28/1958Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/12/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
11/11/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
10/18/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/10/1962Letter Filed
08/09/1960Order from Lower Court filed
07/20/1959Brief in Support of Petition
07/09/1959Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/24/1959Opinion issued
04/23/1959Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/16/1959Letter Filed
12/04/1958Response to Brief filed
10/07/1958Letter Filed
10/06/1958Brief on the Merits
10/01/1958Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/01/1958Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/26/1958Response to Brief filed
09/19/1958Brief on the Merits
08/25/1958Supplemental Brief filed
08/22/1958Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/17/1958Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/23/1958Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/16/1958Supplemental Brief filed
06/11/1958Brief on the Merits
06/09/1958Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/07/1958Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/14/1958Document received (See Remarks)
04/10/1958Adopt by Reference pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 9.7
04/08/1958Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/28/1958Motion for RehearingFiling granted
11/12/1957Response to Petition
11/11/1957Response to Petition
10/21/1957Motion for Extension of Time filed
10/18/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/18/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Magnolia Petroleum CompanyRespondent
Lillie M. Clifton, et al.Petitioner
Earl A. BrownRespondent
Nelson Jones, Dillard Baker, D.H. Gregg, Walter B. Morgan, W.R. NiblackAmicus Curiae
Beasley and Beasley, John C. Beasley, John C. Foshee, Arthur P. BagbyAmicus Curiae
Robert L. Armstrong, John C. Foshee, Arthur P. Bagby, Beasley and Beasley, John C. BeasleyAmicus Curiae
Turner, Rodgers, Winn, Scurlock and TerryAmicus Curiae
Fred G. GannonAmicus Curiae
Lillie CliftonPetitioner
Dan Moody, Ross Madole, Earl A. BrownAmicus Curiae
R. W. Koontz, et al.Respondent
Storey, Armstrong and Steger and Robert M. Martin, Jr.Amicus Curiae
Dan Moody and Earl A. BrownAmicus Curiae
R. W. KoontzRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information