judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4162
B-4162
08/10/1973
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF ROCKWALL
OWEN LEE MITCHELL, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/01/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/01/1973Supplement to ResponseRespondent
08/21/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
08/10/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/08/1973Response to Motion filed
11/01/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/01/1973Supplement to Response
08/21/1973Response to Petition
08/10/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/10/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Owen Lee Mitchell, et ux.Respondent
CITY OF ROCKWALLPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information