judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0298
94-0298
03/29/1994
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
HIGHLAND MALL JOINT VENTURE AUSTIN MALL INC. AU MANAGEMENT CORPORATION THE ROUSE COMPANY THE ROUSE COMPANY OF TEXAS INC. and CORPORATE PROPERTY INVESTORS
THE HONORABLE JOHN K. DIETZ JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/08/1994Relator's reply brief on the meritsRelator"Defendants' verified reply to Plantiffs' response to Defendants' M/L/F Pet Mand"
04/04/1994Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/05/1994Exhibits returned to the lower court clerks1 sealed envelope to Mr. Clark (Rel)
07/26/1994Case StoredNo Mo/Re filed
07/26/1994list missing briefs when case is separated(remarksDisp Ltr of 03-30-94
06/22/1994M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruled
06/22/1994Stay order vacated. See remarks & op/disp screenstay order of 03-30-94 is vacated
04/08/1994Relator's reply brief on the merits"Defendants' verified reply to Plantiffs' response to Defendants' M/L/F Pet Mand"
04/04/1994Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus
03/30/1994Motion to Stay DisposedFiling grantedstay order issued
03/30/1994Request made for reply to proceedingby Friday, April 8, 1994.
03/30/1994Stay Order issuedstaying Judge Dietz order of February 24, 1994 and enforcement thereof
03/29/1994Motion to Stay Filed "Emergency"
03/29/1994Exhibits receivedOriginal + 2
03/29/1994Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
03/29/1994Petition for writ received
03/29/1994Sealed document filed in case1 in-camera envelope "for judges' eyes only"
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/26/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE ROUSE COMPANYRelatorMs. Robbi B. Hull
CORPORATE PROPERTY INVESTORSRelatorMs. Robbi B. Hull
HIGHLAND MALL JOINT VENTURERelatorHonorable Harley Clark
AUSTIN MALL, INC.RelatorMs. Beverly G. Reeves
THE ROUSE COMPANY OF TEXAS, INRelatorMs. Robbi B. Hull
RANDOLPH, CONTREAL D.RespondentMr. Robert A. Caine
Mr. Waylon L. Allen
FINCH, HUMBRE C.RespondentMr. Ray Chester
AU MANAGEMENT CORPORATIONRelatorMs. Robbi B. Hull
Court of Appeals Information:
03-94-00119-CV
M/L/F Overruled
RULE 90, 03-24-94
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
261st District Court
Travis
Honorable John K. Dietz
93-02934