judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4341
B-4341
12/12/1973
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
JAMES W. HERRING
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/04/1974Errata Filed
07/30/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/14/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
12/12/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/04/1974Errata Filed
07/30/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/24/1974Dissenting opinion issued.
07/24/1974Opinion issued
02/13/1974Document received (See Remarks)
12/14/1973Response to Petition
12/12/1973Document received (See Remarks)
12/12/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
James W. HerringRespondent
Texas Department of CorrectionsPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information