judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0354
94-0354
04/20/1994
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
CLYDE W. STUART
THE HONORABLE MERRILL HARTMAN JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/1994Case StoredNo Mo/Re filed
04/28/1994Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Overruledmotion for leave to proceed on One Typewritten form is overruled
04/28/1994Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See RemarksCORRECTED NOTICE SENT TO INFORM OF OVERRULING OF MO/PROCEED ON 1 TYPEWRITTEN FORM
04/28/1994M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruled
04/20/1994Miscellaneous MotionMotion for leave to proceed on one type-written form Incorporated within M/L/F Pet Mand
04/20/1994Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
04/20/1994Petition for writ receivedIncorporated within M/L/F Pet Mand
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/13/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Stuart, Clyde W.RelatorClyde W. Stuart
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
192nd District Court
Dallas
Honorable Merrill Hartman
93-05239-K