judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00093-CV
02-94-00093-CV
04/19/1994
Miscellaneous civil
In The Interest of K.H. and A.H. (Hart)
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/07/1994Mandate Issued
09/26/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/19/1994Response Filed
09/09/1994Motion Filed
08/23/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/11/1994Submitted
07/11/1994Submission
06/10/1994Submission
06/06/1994Brief Filed
06/06/1994Case ready to be set
05/13/1994Brief Filed
04/20/1994Submission
04/19/1994No Description Available.
04/19/1994No Description Available.
04/19/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/07/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tx Dept Of Human ServicesAppelleeCharles M. Mallin
Hart, KeechaCivil - Ad LitemHugh W. Savage, Jr.
Hart, SandraAppellantRichard A. Gladstone
Hart, AnthonyCivil - Ad LitemHugh W. Savage, Jr.
Trial Court Information
323rd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Scott D. Moore
323-49431-J (92)