judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00365-CR
01-94-00365-CR
04/18/1994
Robbery
Pounds, Aaron Lee
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/23/2005Response to Inmate Letter of Inquiry.
12/07/2005Inmate correspondence
06/12/1998No description available.
03/13/1998Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
01/06/1995Mandate issued
12/14/1994Motion for rehearing was not filed
10/06/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/06/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/04/1994Submitted
10/04/1994Submission
10/04/1994Submitted
08/16/1994Submission
07/25/1994Case ready to be set
07/25/1994Waiver
07/25/1994Case ready to be set
07/21/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
07/21/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/13/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/13/1994Statement of facts filed
06/09/1994Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
05/27/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/27/1994Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
05/20/1994Transcript filed
04/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/14/1994Notice of appeal filed
03/23/1994Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/06/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantStanley C. Kirk
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
678,866
15 yrs tdc