judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0259-94
PD-0259-94
03/09/1994
PDR Case Type
GREGER, BARBARA MARY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/02/1994FINAL DISPRefused
05/18/1994PDR DISPRefused
05/18/1994PDR DISPRefused
04/12/1994NO RESPONSE FILED
03/09/1994PDR FILED
03/09/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/14/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn B. Holmes
GREGER, BARBARA MARYApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Will Outlaw
Court of Appeals Information:
14-93-00006-CR
AFF 1-27-94
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
579662