judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00224-CV
04-94-00224-CV
04/15/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Shannon, William Patrick
Shannon, Georgia Lea
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/03/1996Mandate Issued
06/03/1996Case Returned from Higher Court
06/03/1996Mandate Issued
04/25/1996Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
02/21/1996Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/16/1996Writ of Error filed
01/24/1996Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/24/1996Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
01/24/1996Opinion Withdrawn
11/20/1995Information regarding cause received
09/22/1995Continuation of Information from previous event
09/22/1995Continuation of Information from previous event
09/22/1995Continuation of Information from previous event
09/22/1995Continuation of Information from previous event
09/22/1995Information regarding cause received
08/31/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/16/1995Opinion Withdrawn
08/16/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/16/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
08/16/1995Motion for Rehearing Granted
08/16/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/25/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/10/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/10/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/11/1995Submitted
01/11/1995Submission
01/11/1995Submitted
12/09/1994Submission
08/08/1994Case ready to be set
08/08/1994Brief Filed
08/08/1994Requests Oral Argument
08/08/1994Case ready to be set
08/03/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/03/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/22/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/05/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/05/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/28/1994Brief Filed
06/28/1994Requests Oral Argument
06/28/1994Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
06/23/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/25/1994No Description Available.
05/25/1994No Description Available.
05/17/1994Motion to Supplement Record DisposedFiling is Moot
05/17/1994Motion to Supplement Record DisposedFiling is Moot
05/03/1994No Description Available.
05/03/1994No Description Available.
05/03/1994No Description Available.
05/02/1994Amended Motion Filed
05/02/1994Alternative Dispute Resolution Procedure Sent
04/26/1994Motion to Supplement Record Filed
04/25/1994Judgment Signed in Trial Court
04/15/1994No Description Available.
04/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/25/1994Appeal Bond Filed
01/25/1994Appeal Bond Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/03/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
William Patrick ShannonAppellantMr. ROY R. BARRERA, SR. Sr.
Deanna L. Whitley
Georgia Lea ShannonAppelleeB. F. Pennypacker
Kirk Patterson
Charles H. Jackson, III III
Trial Court Information
166th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carolyn Spears Petersen
73-CI-07326
N/A