judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-2632
B-2632
03/23/1971
Application for Writ of Error
SUNDACO, INC., ET AL.
STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/17/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/06/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
04/14/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
04/09/1971Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
03/23/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/22/1971Response to Motion filed
06/17/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/06/1971Response to Petition
04/14/1971Response to Petition
04/09/1971Brief in Support of Petition
03/25/1971Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filedFiling granted
03/23/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/23/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sundaco, Inc., et al.Petitioner
State of Texas, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information