judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00623-CR
05-82-00623-CR
05/20/1982
Robbery
Sledge, Roy Thomas
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/27/1985Mandate IssuedCt App Rev & Jud Tr Ct Affirmd
12/21/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
08/29/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtMotion or Writ Granted
08/23/1983Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Denied
08/17/1983MattConv
07/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/30/1983Submitted
05/04/1983Submission
03/01/1983Brief Filed
02/17/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/19/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/16/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/16/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/18/1982Brief Filed
09/16/1982Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
07/19/1982Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/20/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/27/1985Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Dallas
F81-32791-MK
10 yrs TDC