judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00154-CR
08-82-00154-CR
05/20/1982
Other Drug Possession
Delgado, Raul Gonzalez
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/08/1984Shuck purged
03/13/1984Mandate Issued
12/28/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/17/1983Submitted
10/12/1983Submission
08/08/1983Brief Filed
08/08/1983Brief Filed
06/08/1983Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/26/1983Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
04/20/1983Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/04/1983Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/16/1983Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/04/1983Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
01/10/1983Brief Filed
12/08/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/24/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/15/1982Record filed.
05/20/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/13/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
244th District Court
Ector
Honorable Joseph Connally
C12,287
15 years