judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00238-CR
04-82-00238-CR
05/21/1982
Burglary
Montemayor, Arturo Guadalupe
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ No Action Taken
04/08/1983No New Event but Update in Calendar
03/23/1983Appeal Reinstated
03/23/1983Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Granted
03/23/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/23/1983Motion for Rehearing Granted
03/18/1983Response to Motion Filed
03/14/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/09/1983Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
03/09/1983Appeal Dismissed
03/09/1983Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/09/1983Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
03/08/1983Brief Filed
03/01/1983Motion for Dismissal Filed
02/22/1983Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/18/1983Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/28/1983Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/07/1983Motion for Leave Filed
01/05/1983Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
01/03/1983Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/06/1982Brief Filed
11/29/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
10/20/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/19/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/22/1982Record Approved
09/01/1982Record Filed
07/02/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
05/21/1982Notice of appeal received
05/21/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/20/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
289th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Raul Rivera
81-CR-2222B
Life