judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00240-CR
04-82-00240-CR
05/21/1982
Assault or Attempted Murder
Dancy, Jr., Tim
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/29/1982Mandate Issued
11/29/1982Mandate Issued
09/21/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/21/1982Motion to Withdraw DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/06/1982No Description Available.
05/25/1982Notice of appeal received
05/21/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
05/21/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
227th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Mike M. Machado
82-CR-0815
10 years