judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8771
B-8771
08/28/1979
Application for Writ of Error
MARGARET GASPARD, ET AL.
JOHN L.COX
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/06/1980Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/13/1979Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/04/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
08/28/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/16/1980Response to Motion filed
06/06/1980Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/05/1980Miscellaneous letter
09/13/1979Reply to Response
09/04/1979Response to Petition
08/28/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/28/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John L.CoxRespondent
Margaret Gaspard, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information