judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8724
B-8724
08/13/1979
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
GUY J. ROBERTSON, RICHARD P. SCHISSLER, JR., AND G AND R INVESTMENT, A PARTNERSHIP
HON. J. CURTISS BROWN, COURT OF CIVIL APPEALS FOR THE 14TH SUPREME JUDICIAL DISTRICT OF TEXAS, AND JAMES K. NANCE, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/07/1980Letter brief Respondent
03/03/1980Letter brief Relator
09/25/1979Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
09/25/1979Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/23/1980Letter Filed
03/07/1980Letter brief
03/03/1980Letter brief
02/26/1980Affidavit filed
12/12/1979Order from Lower Court filed
09/25/1979Exhibits in case/cause filed
09/25/1979Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedFiling granted
08/20/1979Response to Motion filed
08/13/1979Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hon. J. Curtiss Brown, Court of Civil Appeals for the 14th Supreme Judicial District of Texas, and James K. Nance, Jr.Respondent
Guy J. Robertson, Richard P. Schissler, Jr., and G and R Investment, a PartnershipRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information