judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00579-CR
05-82-00579-CR
05/21/1982
Aggravated Manufacture of Methamphetamine
Gary Leon Watson
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/10/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
10/07/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/20/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
03/01/1984Order issued
02/21/1984Motion for rehearing filed
02/07/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/01/1984Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Granted
07/27/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/10/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/07/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
09/22/1982Clerks record filed
09/22/1982Reporters record filed
05/21/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/1984Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of TexasCriminal - State of Texas
Watson, Gary LeonCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
199th Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable Collin District Judge, 199th Distict Court
F82-002-MR
75 years +50,000.00 fine