judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8661
B-8661
07/23/1979
Application for Writ of Error
NRTRX CORPORATION
D. C. STORY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/23/1980Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
12/06/1979Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/08/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/23/1980Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/02/1980Response to Motion filed
12/06/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/08/1979Response to Petition
07/23/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
D. C. StoryRespondent
NRTRX CorporationPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information