judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3735
B-3735
12/27/1972
Application for Writ of Error
WALZEM DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC.
MRS. ANNIE GERFERS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/11/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/09/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
12/27/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/17/1973Letter Filed
07/16/1973Letter Filed
04/19/1973Response to Motion filed
04/11/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/09/1973Response to Petition
12/27/1972Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/27/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mrs. Annie Gerfers, et al.Respondent
Walzem Development Company, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information