judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3771
B-3771
01/08/1973
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF AUSTIN, HUMANE SOCIETY OF AUSTIN AND TRAVIS COUNTY, STATE OF TEXAS, CITY OF AUSTIN, ET AL.
AUSTIN NATIONAL BANK, DR. AND MRS. C. M. DARNALL, ESTEBAN ARREDONDO AND MAGDALENA MARTINEZ, GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF AUSTIN, INC., ANN KNIGHT HOEY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/22/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/27/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/21/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/18/1973Errata FiledRespondent
06/15/1973Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
04/26/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/25/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/30/1973Response to PetitionPetitioner
01/23/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
01/23/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
01/23/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
01/23/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
01/22/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
01/18/1973Response to PetitionPetitioner
01/12/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/08/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/08/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/04/1974Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
01/25/1974Response to Motion filed
01/22/1974Motion for Rehearing
01/04/1974Response to Motion filed
12/28/1973Response to Motion filed
12/27/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/21/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/12/1973Opinion issued
06/18/1973Errata Filed
06/15/1973Supplemental Brief filed
06/05/1973Motion for extension of time to argue. See remarks
06/05/1973Motion for extension of time to argue. See remarksFiling granted
05/23/1973Document received (See Remarks)
05/02/1973Document received (See Remarks)
04/30/1973Response to Motion filed
04/30/1973Response to Motion filed
04/26/1973Motion for Rehearing
04/25/1973Motion for RehearingFiling granted
01/30/1973Response to Petition
01/23/1973Response to Petition
01/23/1973Response to Petition
01/23/1973Response to Petition
01/23/1973Response to Petition
01/22/1973Response to Petition
01/18/1973Response to Petition
01/12/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/08/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/08/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/08/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Austin National BankRespondent
City of AustinPetitioner
Dr. and Mrs. C. M. DarnallRespondent
Humane Society of Austin and Travis CountyPetitioner
Goodwill Industries of Austin, Inc.Respondent
State of TexasPetitioner
Ann Knight HoeyRespondent
Esteban Arredondo and Magdalena MartinezRespondent
CITY OF AUSTIN, ET AL.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information