judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-94-00121-CR
02-94-00121-CR
04/08/1994
Other Drug Possession or Delivery
Burks, Charles Lee
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/19/1995Mandate Issued
08/03/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/30/1995Submitted
05/30/1995Submission
05/08/1995Submission
04/21/1995Brief Filed
04/21/1995Case ready to be set
03/15/1995Letter
03/13/1995Brief Filed
02/15/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/13/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/16/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/13/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
07/29/1994No Description Available.
07/29/1994Submission
07/01/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/29/1994No Description Available.
06/29/1994Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
05/20/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/18/1994No Description Available.
05/09/1994Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
05/03/1994No Description Available.
04/08/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/19/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasBetty Marshall
Burks, Charles LeeCriminal - AppellantCharles H. Roach
Trial Court Information
372nd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Clifford Davis
0452299D
8 YRS IDTDCJ & $5.00 FINE